OR HB4157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 32, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 32, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to establish and administer program to provide one-time assistance payments to low-income households to address negative economic impacts of COVID-19 public health emergency. Directs Department of Revenue to establish and administer program to provide one-time assistance payments to low-income households to address negative economic impacts of COVID-19 public health emergency. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to relief payments to low-income households; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 32, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 2--Findley, Linthicum; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-03-02 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Valderrama. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, George, Hayden, Hieb, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Weber, Wright; Excused, 2--Lively, Zika. |
2022-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |