OR HB4156 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits carriers offering health benefit plans from making specified changes to prescription drug coverage during plan year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drug coverage by health benefit plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback