OR HB4155 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 88, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 9, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits public bodies from contracting with broadband Internet access service providers that engage in certain network management activities based on paid prioritization, content blocking or other discrimination. Prohibits broadband Internet access service provider from disclosing, selling or permitting access to personal information of customers of provider. Creates exceptions, including exception for giving express consent.] Requires broadband Internet access service provider to take reasonable measures to protect personal information of customers of provider.] Requires broadband Internet access service provider to provide notice of provisions of Act to potential customers of provider.] Makes violation of Act unlawful trade practice.] Establishes Task Force on Broadband Security to study uniformity of laws throughout United States with respect to protecting customers of broadband Internet access service providers. Requires task force to submit report, including recommendations for legislation, to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than December 15, 2018.] Provides limited exceptions, including for activities necessary to address needs of public safety and law enforcement. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Internet service providers; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 24 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 88, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 9, 2018.
2018-04-09HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Winters; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-27SenateReferred to Rules.
2018-02-27SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2018-02-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 3--Boone, Olson, Sprenger.
2018-02-26HouseMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 32--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Absent, 1--McKeown; Excused, 3--Boone, Olson, Sprenger.
2018-02-23HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-22HouseMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments, be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-22HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2018-02-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2018-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4155
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/House%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4155/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27248
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432581
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432589
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27373
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433330

Bill Comments

feedback