OR HB4153 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Oregon State Lottery from offering games playable via mobile phone, personal computer or other personal electronic device, except for certain sports betting and multistate numbers drawing games. Prohibits Oregon State Lottery from offering games playable via mobile phone, personal computer or other personal electronic device, except for live] certain sports betting and certain] multistate numbers drawing games.
Title
Relating to limitations on gambling using personal electronic devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Boshart Davis [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue. |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |