OR HB4153 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter 6, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates Eastern Oregon University as Oregon's Rural University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Eastern Oregon University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseChapter 6, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-06HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
2018-02-23SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2018 Calendar.
2018-02-12HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback