OR HB4153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter 6, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter 6, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Eastern Oregon University as Oregon's Rural University.
Title
Relating to Eastern Oregon University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Chapter 6, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-12 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |