OR HB4150 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 10, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 2, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 10, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 2, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Health Information Technology Oversight Council to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to explore options to accelerate, support and improve secure, statewide community information exchanges. Requires Health Information Technology Oversight Council to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to explore options to accelerate, support and improve secure, statewide community information exchanges. Requires council to provide to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health and to human services draft report no later than September 15, 2022, and final report no later than January 31, 2023, on findings of stakeholder and expert groups and recommendations for legislative changes, if needed, to implement statewide health information and community information exchanges. Sunsets February 28, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to access to information about community services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Chapter 10, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 2, 2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Findley, Gelser Blouin, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 13--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 6--Bynum, Morgan, Noble, Power, Prusak, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Evans, Holvey, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |