OR HB4150 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 38, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires specified information to be shared with student, staff member or certain person following conclusion of investigation related to sexual harassment. Requires specified information to be shared with student, or] staff member or certain person following conclusion of investigation related to sexual harassment. Directs State Board of Education to adopt requirements for school district policies on sexual harassment by staff members and students of persons who are on or immediately adjacent to school grounds, at any school-sponsored activity, on school-provided transportation or at any official school bus stop. Takes effect July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school sexual harassment policies; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 38, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-28SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark.
2018-02-20HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback