OR HB4149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 37, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits prosecuting attorney from conditioning plea offer on requirement that defendant or defense attorney stipulate to unconstitutionality of existing law. Prohibits prosecuting attorney from conditioning plea offer or release on defendant's waiver of specified rights, eligibilities and legal challenges] on requirement that defendant or defense attorney stipulate to unconstitutionality of existing law. Provides that prohibited provision in plea agreement or release agreement] is void and unenforceable. Prohibits court from conditioning defendant's release on waiver of defendant's appearance in person at trial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited provisions in criminal action agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 37, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Johnson; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark.
2018-02-20HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback