OR HB4146 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that part-time faculty member at public institution of higher education who qualifies for health care benefits will pay 10 percent of insurance premiums for employee coverage. Requires state to pay for remaining costs of insurance premiums out of moneys appropriated to Oregon Educators Benefit Board. Permits institution to agree through either institution policy or collective bargaining to pay portion of health care benefits paid for by employee. Provides that employees who are eligible to receive health care benefits in manner specified may receive health care benefits from institution only in manner specified. Provides that any savings realized by institution are subject to collective bargaining. Directs board to determine prior to open enrollment period whether it has received sufficient funds to cover required premium payments. Provides that if board has not received sufficient funds, board may require employee share to increase and that institution is not responsible for paying insurance premiums. Requires legacy health benefit coverage to be maintained for part-time faculty at institutions who are not eligible for health care benefits under provisions. Establishes Part-Time Faculty Insurance Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to board. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employees at public institutions of higher education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |