OR HB4142 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands prohibition against retroactive rulemaking by Department of Revenue to prohibit department from adopting or amending rule to require change in tax treatment of item. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authority of Department of Revenue to modify administrative rules; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback