OR HB4141 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 65, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each public university to establish advisory body to advise university president on recommendations to governing board regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Requires each public university to establish advisory body to advise university president on recommendations to governing board regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Requires public university to provide specified training and information to advisory body. Requires advisory body to document consideration of specified impacts of recommended resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees before making recommendation to president of university to increase resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees by more than five percent annually. Requires advisory body to provide meaningful opportunities to participate in process and deliberation of advisory body to recognized student government and other students enrolled at public university. Requires advisory body to provide written report to president of university setting forth recommendations, deliberations and observations of advisory body regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Specifies contents of report. Requires governing board to receive and consider written reports from advisory body when determining tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Provides that if Higher Education Coordinating Commission must approve request by governing board to increase total of resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees for undergraduate resident students by more than five percent, that public university will provide commission with written reports from advisory body and any other information or materials commission determines are necessary for commission to reach determination. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to setting the costs of attending public universities; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 65, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-28SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 1--Stark.
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4141
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4141/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27224
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432035
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27306
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433197
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433952

Bill Comments

feedback