OR HB4139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 74, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 74, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Transportation to establish program to reduce greenhouse gas emissions that assesses greenhouse gas emissions attributable to certain covered materials department uses in construction and maintenance activities for state's transportation system, conducts life cycle assessments for selected set of construction and maintenance activities and devises strategies for reducing greenhouse gas emissions. Requires Department of Transportation to establish program to reduce greenhouse gas emissions that assesses greenhouse gas emissions attributable to certain covered materials department uses in construction and maintenance activities for state's transportation system, conducts life cycle assessments for selected set of construction and maintenance activities and devises strategies for reducing greenhouse gas emissions. Specifies required scope and content of program. Requires department, in making procurements in connection with program, to require contractors to submit environmental product declarations before installing covered materials. Specifies exceptions. Prohibits department from using environmental product declarations to rank or score bid or proposal before January 1, 2027. Requires department to establish grant program to assist bidders and proposers in preparing or submitting environmental product declarations. Requires department to establish technical advisory committee and specifies matters on which committee will advise department. Requires department to report annually to Oregon Transportation Commission and interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to transportation concerning implementation of program. Establishes Medium and Heavy-Duty Electrification Charging Fund in State Treasury, separate and distinct from General Fund, and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Environmental Quality for grant program to support zero emission vehicle charging and fueling infrastructure. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to reductions of greenhouse gas emissions in the state's transportation system; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 74, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Cate, Goodwin, Hieb, Morgan, Wallan; Excused, 2--Lively, Zika. |
2022-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |