OR HB4139 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes notification requirements for school district upon receipt of report of act of harassment, intimidation, bullying or cyberbullying. Takes effect July 1, 2020.
Title
Relating to procedures for hostile educational environments; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Drazan. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Greenlick, Hayden, Stark. |
2020-02-20 | House | Carried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-19 | House | Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Education. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |