OR HB4133 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 63, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee to conduct studies and reviews of incidence of maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity. Provides that information obtained, created or maintained by committee is confidential and exempt from disclosure as public record and inadmissible as evidence in judicial, administrative, arbitration or mediation proceeding. Requires committee to submit biennial report relating to maternal mortality to interim committees related to health care. Requires committee to submit first biennial report no later than January 1, 2021. Requires each biennial report submitted after January 2, 2021, to include information relating to severe maternal morbidity. Requires committee to submit progress report to interim committees related to health care no later than January 1, 2019. Requires committee to perform studies and reviews of incidence of maternal mortality no later than July 1, 2019. Requires committee to commence studies and reviews of incidence of severe maternal morbidity no later than July 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 63, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Kruse, Thatcher, Winters.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-23HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4133
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27183
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27368
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433309
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433602

Bill Comments

feedback