OR HB4130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Transportation for wildlife corridor projects. Appropriates moneys to Department of Transportation for wildlife corridor projects. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wildlife corridors; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |