OR HB4130 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 62, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes grant program under which Department of Education awards grants to school districts for percentage of certain student transportation costs for which school district does not receive any amount in distributions from State School Fund or any amount related to transit activities. Establishes grant program under which Department of Education awards grants to school districts for percentage of certain student transportation costs for which school district does not receive any amount in distributions from State School Fund or any amount related to transit activities. Takes effect July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to student transportation; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 62, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Thatcher.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Lively. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback