OR HB4129 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 61, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Health Licensing Office to issue residential care facility administrator license to qualified applicant. Renames Nursing Home Administrators Board as Long Term Care Administrators Board. Prohibits board from carrying out disciplinary action against licensee unless at least one board member who represents type of license held by licensee is present at board meetings related to disciplinary action. Requires individual currently employed as residential care facility administrator in Oregon, or individual seeking employment as residential care facility administrator in Oregon prior to January 1, 2022, to apply for residential care facility administrator license by July 1, 2019. Allows Health Licensing Office to issue provisional residential care facility administrator license to qualified individual. Requires individual who holds provisional residential care facility administrator license to obtain residential care facility administrator license not later than January 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to residential care facilities; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 61, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Thatcher.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 1--Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Stark.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-23HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4129
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27205
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27366
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433292
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433608

Bill Comments

feedback