OR HB4129 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases rate of taxation on cigarettes and tobacco products. Expands definition of tobacco products for purpose of tax to include electronic cigarettes and nicotine solution. Distributes tax revenues from increases in cigarette tax and tobacco products tax to Oregon Health Authority to provide preventive services and innovative, nontraditional health services, including mental health services and treatment for substance use disorders, through coordinated care organizations. Applies to distributions of cigarettes and tobacco products occurring on or after January 1, 2015. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation of products containing nicotine; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4129 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4129/Introduced |