OR HB4127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Permits contracting agency, in conducting procurement for architectural, engineering, photogrammetric mapping, transportation planning and land surveying services, to consider pricing policies, proposals and other pricing information along with prospective consultant's qualifications in specified circumstances. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a consultant selection process for a public contract for certain services; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2018-02-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to General Government and Accountability.
2018-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barreto, Boles, Esquivel, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Nathanson, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Whisnant, Williamson, Wilson, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Stark.
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback