OR HB4125 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that insurer's cancellation of automobile insurance policy is not effective unless insurer mails or delivers notice of cancellation to named insured at least 30 days before effective date of cancellation, if policy or coverage has been in effect for 60 days or more, or at least 10 days before effective date of cancellation if cancellation is for nonpayment of premium or if policy or coverage has been in effect for less than 60 days. Requires insurer to mail or deliver notice of cancellation of automobile insurance policy at least 30 days before effective date of cancellation.] Requires insurer to include statement of reasons for cancellation under specified circumstances. Applies to vehicle liability policies issued on or after effective date of Act.
Title
Relating to the cancellation of automobile insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Post, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse. |
2020-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |