OR HB4124 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 117, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows county governing body, upon remand of matter from Land Use Board of Appeals to county, to have planning commission or hearings officer conduct hearing and make decision regarding lands designated under statewide planning goal addressing agricultural lands or forestlands. Requires county governing body to review planning commission or hearings officer decision and take one of three specified actions on decision. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remanded land use decisions; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 117, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
2018-04-13HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Winters.
2018-02-27SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2018-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Gomberg, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reardon.
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback