OR HB4123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Act gives money to the DOJ to give to the Sexual Assault Task Force for SANE certification. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.0). Appropriates moneys to the Department of Justice to fund the management of the Oregon SAE/SANE Certification Commission by the Attorney General's Sexual Assault Task Force.
Title
Relating to the Sexual Assault Task Force.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |