OR HB4122 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to establish program to distribute funds to community-based organizations to provide financial assistance to Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals status recipients for specified purposes. Directs Department of Human Services to establish program to award grants to] distribute funds to community-based organizations to provide financial assistance to Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals status recipients for specified purposes. Sunsets January 1, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to immigration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |