OR HB4121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Housing and Community Services Department to establish and administer program that provides incentive payments to construction contractors undertaking energy improvement projects on residential structures and provides grants for energy improvement projects for manufactured dwellings. Requires that contractors use incentive payments to reduce amounts paid by property owners for projects. Reserves portions of program moneys for activities promoting healthy affordable housing environments and for grants relating to manufactured dwellings owned and occupied by persons having low income or very low income. Limits program expenditures for biennium ending June 30, 2019. Sunsets program January 2, 2022. Requires sustainable energy project manager to refer applicant for small scale energy loan to department if applicant has income qualifying applicant for department weatherization program. Authorizes department to enter into agreements with other units of state government to facilitate department administration of home weatherization programs for persons with low income or very low income. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Housing and Community Services Department programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |