OR HB4120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for transition services for current foster children and former foster children. Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for transition services for current foster children and former foster children. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transition services for foster children; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |