OR HB4120 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 34, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of "transient lodging intermediary" to include person that collects consideration for occupancy of transient lodging and person that receives fee or commission and requires transient lodging provider to use specified third-party entity to collect consideration for occupancy of transient lodging. Provides joint and several liability for state transient lodging tax for each and every owner of transient lodging. Provides rules governing filing of local transient lodging tax returns. Authorizes unit of local government to subpoena and examine witnesses, administer oaths and order production of evidence in hands of any person as necessary and proper in prosecution of inquiries related to local transient lodging tax.] Takes effect on later of 91st day following adjournment sine die or July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transient lodging taxes; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 34, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2018-02-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-22HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2018-02-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 8--Bonham, Hayden, Heard, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB, Williamson, Witt.
2018-02-21HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-19HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session cancelled.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback