OR HB4119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cougars; declaring an emergency; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Title
Relating to cougars; declaring an emergency; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.state.or.us/MeasureInfo/Measure/AtGlance?session=36&MeasureNumber=HB4119 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/12reg/measures/hb4100.dir/hb4119.intro.html |