OR HB4118 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 96, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses state policy regarding pursuit of projects under Good Neighbor Authority Agreement. Instructs signatory state agencies to work with federal land management agencies to prioritize projects. Requires Governor and Federal Forest Working Group to jointly develop recommendations for goals of Good Neighbor Authority Agreement. Establishes deadline for Governor or designee agency to report recommendations for goals to Legislative Assembly. Allocates lottery funds] Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for supporting development, planning or implementation of priority projects on federal forestland under Good Neighbor Authority Agreement. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to projects on federal lands; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, rescind subsequent referral to Legislative Audits, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 96, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Holvey; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-28HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2018-02-16HouseSubsequent referral to Legislative Audits rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Legislative Audits be rescinded, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Legislative Audits.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4118
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4118/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27203
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27409
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433774
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433953

Bill Comments

feedback