OR HB4116 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 32, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies definitions, exceptions and affirmative defenses applicable to offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device. Modifies definitions, exceptions and affirmative defenses applicable to offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device. Provides that enhanced classification of offense may only be based on prior conviction occurring on or after July 1, 2018. Creates procedure by which person convicted of enhanced offense based on prior conviction occurring prior to July 1, 2018, may request that court redetermine classification of offense. Takes effect July 1, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 32, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark.
2018-02-20HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback