OR HB4116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 32, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 32, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions, exceptions and affirmative defenses applicable to offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device. Modifies definitions, exceptions and affirmative defenses applicable to offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device. Provides that enhanced classification of offense may only be based on prior conviction occurring on or after July 1, 2018. Creates procedure by which person convicted of enhanced offense based on prior conviction occurring prior to July 1, 2018, may request that court redetermine classification of offense. Takes effect July 1, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the offense of driving a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 32, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark. |
2018-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |