OR HB4115 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies retirement plan options of persons elected or appointed as statewide elected officials or judges. Prohibits statewide elected official, judge of Supreme Court or Court of Appeals or legislator from becoming member of Public Employees Retirement System on or after July 1, 2018, for purpose of service as statewide elected official, judge or legislator.] Provides that statewide elected official, judge of Supreme Court or Court of Appeals or legislator may not accrue benefits under Public Employees Retirement System for purpose of service as statewide elected official, judge or legislator on or after July 1, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the retirement benefits of state officers; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-16 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-16HouseMotion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 31--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Clem, Doherty, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback