OR HB4115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies retirement plan options of persons elected or appointed as statewide elected officials or judges. Prohibits statewide elected official, judge of Supreme Court or Court of Appeals or legislator from becoming member of Public Employees Retirement System on or after July 1, 2018, for purpose of service as statewide elected official, judge or legislator.] Provides that statewide elected official, judge of Supreme Court or Court of Appeals or legislator may not accrue benefits under Public Employees Retirement System for purpose of service as statewide elected official, judge or legislator on or after July 1, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the retirement benefits of state officers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 31--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Clem, Doherty, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |