OR HB4114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires medical assistance and health benefit plan coverage of renal dialysis. Limits charge that may be billed or collected for providing renal dialysis. Limits out-of-pocket costs for renal dialysis provided to enrollee in health benefit plan. Prohibits outpatient renal dialysis facility from denying service to person based on person's inability to pay for renal dialysis.
Title
Relating to dialysis.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4114 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4114/Introduced |