OR HB4113 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Includes class size as mandatory subject of school district collective bargaining.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school class size as a mandatory subject of collective bargaining.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-20HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Marsh, Smith DB, Sollman.
2018-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boone, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Lewis, Marsh, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith DB, Sollman, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Stark.
2018-02-19HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2018 Calendar.
2018-02-16HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback