OR HB4112 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for Educator Advancement Council to provide professional learning opportunities related to ethnic studies standards adopted by department. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for Educator Advancement Council to provide professional learning opportunities related to ethnic studies standards adopted by department. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to ethnic studies standards; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |