OR HB4112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies allocation formula for grants to children's advocacy centers. Establishes Child Abuse Assessment Account within State Treasury for purpose of grant program for children's advocacy centers. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for purpose of funding program. Limits biennial expenditures by department for grant program from Child Abuse Assessment Account. Modifies authority of Advisory Council on Child Abuse Assessment to deposit contributions to Child Abuse Multidisciplinary Intervention Account and Child Abuse Assessment Account. Permits Department of Justice to use moneys from Criminal Injuries Compensation Account to pay for medical services provided by children's advocacy center in cases of suspected child sexual abuse or child physical abuse. Directs University of Oregon to conduct Oregon child abuse prevalence study and to submit report regarding study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for study. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for purposes of developing curricula and providing educator training for instructional requirements that relate to child sexual abuse prevention, human sexuality education, teen dating violence and domestic violence, and similar instructional requirements that relate to child safety. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to child safety; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |