OR HB4109 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Environmental Quality and State Forestry Department to study opportunities for state actions to promote carbon sequestration and to include in study consideration of regional approaches for reducing greenhouse gas emissions through carbon sequestration. Requires departments to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources by September 15, 2019. Sunsets January 2, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to carbon sequestration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback