OR HB4106 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to biennially report to Legislative Assembly regarding estimated change in wolf population. Requires Legislative Assembly to identify amount of state funding necessary to provide counties with assistance sufficient for carrying out essential features of county programs regarding wolf depredation and financial assistance. Requires Legislative Assembly to review estimate of change in wolf population prior to making appropriation to fund used for wolf depredation and financial assistance grant program. Requires that Legislative Assembly establish, to extent practicable, fund appropriation amount greater than identified necessary funding amount and reflecting estimated change in wolf population.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wolves.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback