OR HB4105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 64, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 64, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes duly authorized traffic enforcement agents to review and issue citations based on photographs taken by photo red light cameras or photographs taken by photo radar cameras. Authorizes duly authorized traffic enforcement agents to review and issue citations based on photographs taken by photo red light cameras or photographs taken by photo radar cameras. Defines "duly authorized traffic enforcement agent." Authorizes duly authorized traffic enforcement agents to present evidence , examine and cross-examine witnesses and make arguments] in trials relating to citations issued by agent.
Title
Relating to traffic offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 64, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Cate, Evans, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hoy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Neron, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright; Excused, 1--Zika. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 6--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 6--Beyer, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-15 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Nelson. |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 23--Bonham, Cate, Evans, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hoy, Levy, Lewis, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Neron, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith DB, Stark, Weber, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Speaker Rayfield, Wallan. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 15, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |