OR HB4104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes political contributions received by candidate, principal campaign committee of candidate or principal campaign committee of holder of public office to be used to defray both health insurance premiums for candidate or holder of public office and members of household of candidate or holder of public office and caregiving expenses for relative of candidate or holder of public office. Limits period when political contributions may be used for these purposes to when candidate or holder of public office is campaigning for public office.
Title
Relating to use of campaign funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4104 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4104/Introduced |