OR HB4104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 9, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies requirements for health benefit plan coverage of hearing loss treatments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to hearing loss.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 9, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Kruse.
2018-02-23SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Malstrom, Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively.
2018-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback