OR HB4099 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Racial Equity and Justice Youth Collaborative. Establishes Racial Equity and Justice Youth Collaborative. Prescribes membership and duties of collaborative. Directs Department of Education to establish work group to establish standards for selection process of members of collaborative. Sunsets work group on August 30, 2023. Takes effect July 1, 2022.
Title
Relating to youth leadership; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |