OR HB4098 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 30, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to develop written material regarding apprenticeship opportunities and provide material to certain agencies, county veterans' service officers and veterans' organizations for distribution to veterans. Directs department to provide annual training to county veterans' service officers and veterans' organizations regarding apprenticeship programs and federal and state education benefits. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to veterans; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 30, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Winters.
2018-02-27SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2018-02-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Meek, Heard. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Hayden, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner.
2018-02-15HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback