OR HB4092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows owner of reservoir located on specified property within Big Butte Creek drainage area to register reservoir with Water Resources Department. Establishes application and qualification deadlines. Exempts registered reservoir from water right permit and water right certificate requirements. Prohibits diversion or other uses, except for suppressing or extinguishing fire, of reservoir water. Makes reservoir use subservient to water rights. Requires property owner to measure and report flows into and out of reservoir. Requires department to order removal of reservoir if not registered. Requires department to cancel registration and order removal of reservoir if reservoir ceases to meet requirements.
Title
Relating to the registration of reservoirs within the Big Butte Creek drainage area.
Sponsors
Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Wallan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Owens, Smith G. |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 12, 2020 Calendar. |
2020-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Water. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |