OR HB4092 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes standards for expansion of state airport on land zoned for exclusive farm use. Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to prioritize state airports for resiliency investments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state airports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2018-02-15HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Transportation Policy.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback