OR HB4090 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Strategic Resiliency Commission. Requires commission to develop and administer program for rebates and investments to provide incentives for increasing amount, availability and security of regional foodstuff supplies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regional foodstuff supplies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback