OR HB4089 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 116, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gives hemp research program currently operated by State Department of Agriculture name of Oregon Industrial Hemp Agricultural Pilot Program. Authorizes actions by department to carry out program. Specifies that agricultural hemp seed is agricultural seed or flower seed for purposes of statutes regulating labeling, testing, certifying or other aspects of seeds. Directs Director of Agriculture and Dean of College of Agricultural Sciences of Oregon State University to establish program for labeling and certification of agricultural hemp seed. Provides that accredited independent testing laboratory that has been approved by Oregon Health Authority or department may test industrial hemp and industrial hemp commodities and products produced or processed by grower, handler or agricultural hemp seed producer. Requires that industrial hemp intended for human consumption be entered into tracking system prior to laboratory testing and through delivery to licensed premises. Modifies other provisions related to regulation of industrial hemp. Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission actions regarding industrial hemp to enforce and ensure compliance with marijuana laws and provisions of industrial hemp laws that incorporate requirements, restrictions or other provisions of marijuana laws. Prohibits sale of industrial hemp containing more than 0.3 percent tetrahydrocannabinol to consumer by person other than licensed retailer. Changes description of limit on production and storage of homegrown cannabis plants. Prohibits production, processing or storage of homemade industrial hemp extracts. Allows department to adopt rule establishing higher average tetrahydrocannabinol concentration limit for industrial hemp if higher average concentration limit is established by federal law. Revises language regarding grower retention of agricultural hemp seed for producing industrial hemp. Establishes Industrial Hemp Fund. Appropriates fund moneys to department for purposes of implementing, administering and enforcing industrial hemp statutes. Directs certain moneys to fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to industrial hemp; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 116, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
2018-04-13HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-03-01HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-03-01HouseWork Session held.
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4089
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4089/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27209
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27408
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433773
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433951

Bill Comments

feedback