OR HB4085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allocates lottery moneys from Veterans' Services Fund to Long Term Care Ombudsman for purpose of providing public guardian and conservator services to veterans. Decreases biennial appropriation from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Long Term Care Ombudsman] Allocates lottery moneys from Veterans' Services Fund to Long Term Care Ombudsman for purpose of providing public guardian and conservator services to veterans. Limits biennial expenditures of Long Term Care Ombudsman of certain moneys for purpose of providing public guardian and conservator services to veterans. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to veterans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |