OR HB4085 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires court to award attorney fees, costs and necessary disbursements to tenant prevailing in action arising under rental agreement or landlord-tenant law. Authorizes court to award attorney fees, costs and necessary disbursements to landlord prevailing in action arising under rental agreement or landlord-tenant law. Requires court to award attorney fees, costs and necessary disbursements to landlord prevailing in action arising under rental agreement or landlord-tenant law if court determines tenant had no reasonable basis for asserting claim or appealing judgment. Authorizes court to award attorney fees, costs and necessary disbursements to prevailing party in action arising under rental agreement or landlord-tenant law but not between landlord and tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judgments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-15HouseInformational Meeting scheduled.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback